IL HB2382 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Fire Hydrant Act. Defines "dry hydrant". Contains provisions concerning the maintenance of and access to specified dry hydrants. Provides that all other dry hydrants shall be subject to specified provisions of the Act and a specified additional requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIRE HYDRANT ACT-DRY HYDRANTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0259
2017-08-22HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-22HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-004-000
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 004-000-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
425202Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback