IL HB2380 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Human Services Professional Loan Repayment Program Act. Provides that a community-based human services agency may contract with, receive funding from, or be grant-funded by a State agency (instead of may contract with or be grant-funded by a State agency). Provides that the Illinois Student Assistance Commission, in awarding grants under the Act, may grant preference to applicants based on need or income levels. Removes the provision limiting the grant to an applicant for a cumulative maximum of 4 years. In provisions regarding the eligibility of an applicant, provides that the applicant shall have been a full-time employee for at least 24 consecutive months as a human services professional and the community-based human services agency shall currently have or have had a contract with, receive funding from, or be grant-funded by a State agency for the purpose of providing human services during the applicant's 24 consecutive month tenure (instead of shall have worked for at least 24 consecutive months as a full-time employee as a human services professional in a community-based human services agency that currently has or did have a contract with a State agency to provide human services during the duration of applicant's 24 consecutive month tenure). Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
HIGHER ED-HUM SERV LOAN REPAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0031 |
2023-06-09 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2023 |
2023-06-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-007-000 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-036-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000 |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar González, Jr. |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 997 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 997 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 997 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 997 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |