IL HB2380 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that on or after the effective date of the bill, any provision in a collective bargaining agreement which would limit the ability of a public employer to investigate the conduct of an employee of the public employer is hereby declared to be against public policy and unenforceable unless the limitation is otherwise required by State or federal law. Amends the State Police Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall have a procedure to bypass the requirement that a complaint must be supported by a sworn affidavit against a State Police Officer. Amends the Uniform Peace Officers' Disciplinary Act. Provides that every law enforcement agency or local governmental unit shall have a procedure to bypass the requirement that complaint must be supported by a sworn affidavit against a sworn peace officer.
Title
POLICE DISCIPLINARY COMPLAINT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-11-07 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 725 | 3.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2380&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2380.htm |