IL HB2379 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Failed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Failed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Fiscal Impact Statement Act. Provides that every executive order of the Governor, the purpose or effect of which is to expend any State funds or to increase or decrease the revenues of the State, either directly or indirectly, shall include a fiscal impact statement, and that the fiscal impact statement shall contain a reliable estimate of the anticipated change in State expenditures or revenues and a reliable estimate of the fiscal impact. Provides that, if an executive order affects bond authority or bond rates, the fiscal impact statement shall be prepared by the Governor's Office of Management and Budget, shall specify the estimated total effect on principal and interest, and shall include the total principal on all other then-outstanding bonds of the State. Provides for the preparation, filing, and publication of fiscal impact statements. Effective immediately.
Title
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2017-08-22 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-08-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-001-001 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 9, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-029-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |