IL HB2379 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Defines "energy drink" as any soft drink with a caffeine level of 6 mg or more per ounce. Provides that it is unlawful in this State for any person to sell, offer for sale, or deliver an energy drink to a person under 18 years of age. Provides that in addition to any other remedies provided by law, the Director of Public Health is authorized to file a complaint and apply to the circuit court for, and such court may upon hearing and for cause shown grant, a temporary restraining order or preliminary or permanent injunction restraining any person from violating the provision concerning energy drinks.
Title
FOOD-DRUG-ENERGY DRINKS
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] |
Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-005-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Re-assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 18(f) Rules to Re-assign to Executive Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Re-assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |