IL HB2373 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-9)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that the court may order the sealing of the records of arrests or charges not initiated by arrest which result in an order of supervision or a conviction for a misdemeanor violation of public indecency. Provides that the court may not order the sealing of the records of arrests or charges not initiated by arrest which result in an order of supervision or a conviction for offenses under the Humane Care for Animals Act (rather than Class A misdemeanors under the Act). Eliminates multiple offenses and circumstances of the charge where records may currently be sealed. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM ID-SEALING ELIGIBILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-019-002
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-10SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-10SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-03SenateAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-034-000
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-07HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-004-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-10HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback