IL HB2369 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-28 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Deletes the term "no-wrong-door" in provisions regarding the system of support for service members, veterans, and their families. Removes provisions requiring the Illinois Joining Forces Foundation (Foundation) to utilize working groups when convening military and veteran support organizations and when providing policy recommendations that benefit service members, veterans, and their families. Removes provisions requiring the Foundation to facilitate the transfer of information and knowledge among Illinois Joining Forces member organizations. Makes changes to the definition of "veterans service organization". Provides that the Foundation may also include up to 18 additional voting members of the Board of Directors: 9 members to be nominated and approved by the Board of Directors according to the Foundation's bylaws, and 9 members to be nominated by the Director of Veterans' Affairs or the Director of Military Affairs. Provides that, to ensure parity, no additional nominees may be considered by the Board of Directors unless a like appointment is made by the Department of Veterans' Affairs or the Department of Military Affairs, and vice versa. Provides that, in consultation with the Foundation's Board of Directors, the Department of Veterans' Affairs or the Department of Military Affairs may adopt other rules deemed necessary to govern Foundation procedures (rather than the Department of Veterans' Affairs may adopt rules in consultation with the Department of Military Affairs). Permits the Foundation to receive administrative support including, but not limited to, legal professionals or additionally agreed upon support as needed or requested, from either the Department of Veterans' Affairs or the Department of Military Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEPT VET AFF-JOINING FORCES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-28SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2021-10-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
2021-10-13SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2021-05-29SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2021
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2021-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 006-000-000
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2021-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 006-000-000
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20280537Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback