IL HB2367 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that records of conviction for a non-violent offense or a criminal offense that did not result in bodily harm or death to another person may be sealed 10 years after the termination of the petitioner's last sentence. Provides that the new provisions apply only to a petitioner who has not had one or more criminal convictions between the conviction eligible for sealing and the filing of the petition for relief. Defines "non-violent offense".
Title
CRIM ID-SEALING RECORDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 67 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-11-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-11-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-11-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-11-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-037-000 |
2018-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-26 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2018-11-26 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2018-11-26 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Withdrawn Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Withdrawn Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Withdrawn Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Withdrawn Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 7 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-25 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 7 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 008-002-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 7 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 7 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 7 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed to Table Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed to Table Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 007-005-000 |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-01-30 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-03-09 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |