IL HB2367 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that records of conviction for a non-violent offense or a criminal offense that did not result in bodily harm or death to another person may be sealed 10 years after the termination of the petitioner's last sentence. Provides that the new provisions apply only to a petitioner who has not had one or more criminal convictions between the conviction eligible for sealing and the filing of the petition for relief. Defines "non-violent offense".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM ID-SEALING RECORDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 67 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-11-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-11-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-11-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-037-000
2018-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-26HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-11-26HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-11-26HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Withdrawn Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Withdrawn Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Withdrawn Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Withdrawn Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 7 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 7 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 008-002-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 7 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 7 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 7 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed to Table Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed to Table Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 007-005-000
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee
2018-02-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-01-30HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-09HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Restorative Justice Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2367&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2367.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2367eng.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2367ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2367ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2367ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2367ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2367ham005.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2367ham006.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2367ham007.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2367_11292018_016000.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback