IL HB2366 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that the provisions concerning community schools apply beginning with the 2024-2025 (rather than 2009-2010) school year. Makes changes to the legislative findings, including replacing a description of a community school. Provides that grants for community schools are subject to the availability of State or federal funding (rather than the availability of funding). Removes certain grant proposal provisions. Changes the requirements to qualify for a grant. Effective June 1, 2024.
Title
SCH CD-COMMUNITY SCHOOLS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |