IL HB2360 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Secure Choice Savings Program Act. Requires the Board to select a default contribution rate within the range of 3% to 6% of an enrollee's wages (rather than 3% of wages). Provides that the Program shall begin during 2018, rather than by July 1, 2017. Provides that the Board shall establish an implementation timeline that ensures that all employees are required to enroll in the Program by December 31, 2020. Provides that the Illinois Secure Choice Savings Program Fund is a instrumentality of the State and not subject to specified provisions of the Illinois Securities Law of 1953. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SECURE CHOICE SAVINGS PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-03-15SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-036-000
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 012-002-000
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8208015Amended CodeCitation Text
8208030Amended CodeCitation Text
8208055Amended CodeCitation Text
8208060Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback