IL HB2354 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Lethal Violence Order of Protection Act. Provides that a petitioner may request an emergency lethal violence order of protection by filing an affidavit or verified pleading alleging that the respondent poses an immediate and present danger of causing personal injury to himself, herself, or another by having in his or her custody or control, owning, purchasing, possessing, or receiving a firearm. Provides that the petition shall also describe the type, and location of any firearm or firearms presently believed by the petitioner to be possessed or controlled by the respondent. Provides that the petitioner may be a family member of the respondent or a law enforcement officer, who files a petition alleging that the respondent poses a danger of causing personal injury to himself, herself, or another by having in his or her custody or control, owning, purchasing, possessing, or receiving a firearm. Establishes factors that the court must consider before issuing a lethal violence order of protection. Provides for the issuance of ex parte orders and one year orders. Provides that if the court issues the order the respondent must: (1) refrain from having in his or her custody or control, owning, purchasing, possessing, or receiving additional firearms for the duration of the order; and (2) turn over to the local law enforcement agency any firearm, Firearm Owner's Identification Card, or concealed carry license in his or her possession. Establishes factors for renewing and terminating lethal violence orders of protection. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act and the Firearm Concealed Carry Act to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LETHAL ORDER OF PROTECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-032-001
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-23HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-08HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-26HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steven Reick
2018-04-26HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-26HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-01-30HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-21HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-03-20HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-20HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-15HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis
2017-03-15HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430658.2Amended CodeCitation Text
4306670Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback