IL HB2353 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-09-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-24HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-21HouseRe-assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7205502Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback