IL HB2353 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-4)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-4)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities in Illinois to provide that beginning with the 2013-2014 academic year, if a person is utilizing benefits under the federal Post-9/11 Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 2008 or any subsequent variation of that Act, then the corresponding Board of Trustees shall deem that person an Illinois resident for tuition purposes. Amends the Public Community College Act to provide that beginning with the 2013-2014 academic year, if a person is utilizing benefits under the federal Post-9/11 Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 2008 or any subsequent variation of that Act, then the board of trustees of the community college district shall deem that person an in-district resident and Illinois resident for tuition purposes. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-MILITARY-TUITION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0306 |
2013-08-12 | House | Effective Date August 12, 2013 |
2013-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 19, 2013 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2013-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-03-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 013-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-03-01 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-03-01 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-02-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 7e-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 520 | 8d-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 660 | 5-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 665 | 10-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 670 | 15-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 675 | 20-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 680 | 25-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 685 | 30-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 690 | 35-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 6-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 6-4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |