IL HB2351 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Wage Lien Act. Provides that a lien exists on an employer's property for the amount of unpaid wages owed to an employee. Defines terms and includes provisions concerning creation of the lien; exemptions; notice; limitations; recording of the lien; enforcement; other claims on the employer's property; successor obligations; and construction.
Title
WAGE LIEN ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-15 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-07 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-07 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-012-000 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2351&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2351.htm |