IL HB2347 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act. Provides that specified medical conditions are included in the definition of "emergency medical condition" regardless of the final diagnosis that is given. Provides that provisions concerning emergency services prior to stabilization also apply to the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, and the Illinois Public Aid Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INSURANCE-ER SERVICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-28HouseTo Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.3fAmended CodeCitation Text
21513410Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-16.8Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.11Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1069.3Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-4-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback