IL HB2338 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides for the licensure of naturopathic physicians. Makes conforming changes in various other Acts. Effective immediately.
Title
NATUROPATHIC PHYSICIANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 26-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3945 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 122-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 61 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 63 | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 63 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 90 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
710 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2338&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2338.htm |