IL HB2332 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the credit for wages paid to qualified veterans also extends to wages paid to a qualified veteran's spouse. Provides that active duty member of the United States Armed Forces are also considered "qualified veterans". Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-VETERAN'S SPOUSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2332&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2332.htm |