IL HB2315 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Allows the Secretary of State to provide service by email of a document containing a driver's license number. Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that Every Real ID compliant identification card or Real ID compliant Person with a Disability Identification Card issued under the Act to an applicant who is not a United States citizen or permanent resident, other than a conditional resident, shall be marked "Limited Term". Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that every Real ID compliant driver's license issued under this Code to an applicant who is not a United States citizen or permanent resident, other than a conditional resident, shall be marked "Limited Term". Defines "medical examiner's certificate". Provides that the Secretary shall deny, suspend, or revoke registration if the applicant fails to disclose material information required or if the applicant has made a materially false statement on the application, or the applicant has applied as a subterfuge for the real party in interest who has been issued a Federal out-of-service order or if the applicant's business is operated, managed or otherwise controlled or affiliated with a person who is ineligible for registration, including the applicant entity, a relative, family member, corporate officer or shareholder. The Secretary shall deny, suspend, or revoke registration for either a (i) vehicle if the motor carrier responsible for the safety of the vehicle has been prohibited from operating by the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration; or (ii) for a carrier whose business is operated, managed or otherwise controlled or affiliated with a person who is ineligible for registration, which may include the owner, a relative, family member, corporate officer, or shareholder of the carrier. Provides that any law enforcement agency, in addition to the Secretary of State, may seize or confiscate documents or plates issued by the Secretary upon expiration, revocation, cancellation or suspension thereof, or if it is fictitious, or if it has been unlawfully or erroneously issued. Provides requirements for consenting to accept service of documents by email.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOS-VARIOUS-ADMINISTRATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-003-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Transportation; 013-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-014-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-002-000
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Remains in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-004-000
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
153358Amended CodeCitation Text
510010-75Amended CodeCitation Text
62552-111Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-704Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-115Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-209Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-500Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-508.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback