IL HB2301 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Workers' Compensation Act, and the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act. Replaces "employee class" and related terms with "representative of a labor organization recognized under the National Labor Relations Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LABOR-EMPLOYEE CLASS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0384
2019-08-16HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-16HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 074-039-000
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 074-039-000
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-009-000
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-009-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-014-000
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
2019-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 010-004-000
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateDo Pass Labor; 011-004-000
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-08SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-036-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-006-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-007-000
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-20HouseReported Back To Labor & Commerce Committee;
2019-03-20HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Labor & Commerce Committee; 007-000-000
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-06HouseTo Workforce Development Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2055-125Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-155Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-540Amended CodeCitation Text
2055.04Amended CodeCitation Text
2055.13iAmended CodeCitation Text
2056.28 and 5/7.01Amended CodeCitation Text
82030513.1Amended CodeCitation Text
82030519Amended CodeCitation Text
8203054Amended CodeCitation Text
8203058.3Amended CodeCitation Text
82031019Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2301&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2301.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2301eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2301enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0384.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2301ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2301ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2301ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2301sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2301sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2301_04102019_036000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB2301_05232019_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2301sam002_05292019_036001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2301sam001_05292019_036000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback