IL HB2279 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. With respect to the 5 State-funded Retirement Systems: requires each System to prepare and implement a Tier 3 plan by July 1, 2020 that aggregates State and employee contributions in individual participant accounts that are used for payouts after retirement. Provides that a Tier 1 or Tier 2 participant may irrevocably elect to participate in the Tier 3 plan instead of the defined benefit plan and may also elect to terminate all participation in the defined benefit plan and to have a specified amount credited to his or her account under the Tier 3 plan. Makes related changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. In the Downstate Teachers, State Employees, and State Universities Articles, authorizes a person to elect not to participate or to terminate participation in those Systems. In the General Assembly and Judges Articles, authorizes a participant to terminate his or her participation in the System. In the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF), State Employees, State Universities, and Downstate Teachers Articles, for participants who first become participants on or after the effective date, prohibits (i) payments for unused sick or vacation time from being used to calculate pensionable salary and (ii) unused sick or vacation time from being used to establish service credit. In the Downstate Teachers Article, prohibits an employer from making employee contributions on behalf of an employee, except for the sole purpose of allowing an employee to make pre-tax contributions. Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act to prohibit collective bargaining over that prohibition. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-STATE SYS-TIER 3 PLAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-01HouseTo Administrative and Substantive Pension Subcommittee
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115510.6New CodeSee Bill Text
115517Amended CodeCitation Text
11554Amended CodeCitation Text
4051-160Amended CodeCitation Text
4051-161Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-103.05Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-103.10Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-103.41Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-104.3Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-106Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-152.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-155.5New CodeSee Bill Text
40515-108.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-108.2Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-108.3New CodeSee Bill Text
40515-112Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-113.4Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-134Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-198Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-200.5New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-106.41Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-123Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-127Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-152.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-203Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-205.5New CodeSee Bill Text
40518-110.1New CodeSee Bill Text
40518-120Amended CodeCitation Text
40518-121.5New CodeSee Bill Text
40518-124Amended CodeCitation Text
40518-125Amended CodeCitation Text
40518-125.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40518-127Amended CodeCitation Text
40518-128.01Amended CodeCitation Text
40518-133Amended CodeCitation Text
40518-169Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-105.3New CodeSee Bill Text
4052-117Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-162Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-165.5New CodeSee Bill Text
40520-121Amended CodeCitation Text
40520-123Amended CodeCitation Text
40520-124Amended CodeCitation Text
40520-125Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-114Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-116Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-139Amended CodeCitation Text
537510Amended CodeCitation Text
53753Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback