IL HB2275 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Removes language concerning impasse procedures involving an educational employer whose territorial boundaries are coterminous with those of a city having a population in excess of 500,000. Repeals provisions concerning subjects of collective bargaining with that educational employer. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ED EMPLOYEE-IMPASSE PROCEDURES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-03-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-035-000
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-22HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-03-21HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2019-03-21HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-18HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-18HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-18HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-000
2019-03-13HouseReported Back To Labor & Commerce Committee;
2019-03-13HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Labor & Commerce Committee; 007-000-000
2019-03-06HouseTo Workforce Development Subcommittee
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115512Amended CodeCitation Text
11554.5Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback