IL HB2273 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Repeals the definition for "single shot". Defines "wildlife rifle" to mean a rifle that can hold up to 3 rounds in the magazine and chamber combined. Replaces references to "single shot" rifles to "wildlife rifles". Provides that it is unlawful while deer hunting to possess or be in close proximity to a rifle that is not a centerfire wildlife rifle. Removes language providing that it is unlawful while deer hunting to possess or be in close proximity to a rifle that is not centerfire or be in possession of or in close proximity to a magazine that is capable of making a rifle not a single shot.
Title
WILD CD-RIFLE AMMO LIMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-12-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Travis Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 1.2bb | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 1.2t-2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
520 | 5 | 2.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 2.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2273&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2273.htm |