IL HB2269 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Electronic Wills and Remote Witnesses Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Electronic Wills, Electronic Estate Planning Documents, and Remote Witnesses Act. Defines "electronic", "information", "nontestamentary estate planning document", "person", "record", "security procedure", "settlor", "sign", "state", "terms of trust", "trust instrument", and "will". Creates the Electronic Nontestamentary Estate Planning Documents Article. Sets forth provisions related to: construction; scope; principles of law and equity; use of an electronic record or signature; recognition of an electronic nontestamentary estate planning document and electronic signature; attribution and effect of an electronic record and electronic signature; notarization and acknowledgment; witnessing and attestation; retention of an electronic record; certification of a paper copy; admissibility in evidence; relation to the Electronic Signatures in Global and National Commerce Act; application; and severability. Makes conforming changes in the Probate Act of 1975. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
ELECTRONIC NONTEST ESTATE DOCS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0301 |
2023-07-28 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2023-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000 |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 1-2.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 8-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 8-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 6 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 6 | 1-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 6 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 6 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 6 | 11-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | 11-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
755 | 6 | Art. 11 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |