IL HB2267 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides for the election of the Chicago Board of Education at the general primary election in 2020 only as a nonpartisan election on a separate ballot. Provides that a member of the Chicago Board of Education shall be elected at each consolidated election thereafter. Makes related changes. Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Provides that a person shall be a U.S. citizen and registered voter and shall have been a resident of the city and the electoral district for at least one year immediately preceding his or her election. Sets forth provisions concerning nominating petitions and ballots. Sets forth provisions providing that the City of Chicago shall be subdivided into 20 electoral districts by the General Assembly for seats on the Chicago Board of Education. Sets forth provisions providing that in the year following each decennial census, the General Assembly shall redistrict the electoral districts to reflect the results of each decennial census. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTED CHICAGO SCHOOL BOARD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-002-000
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1052A-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1052A-48Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-13.1Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-21.9New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-3Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-4Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-4.1New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-4.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback