IL HB2263 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-16HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-16HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback