IL HB2254 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Provides that if a school fails to meet adequate yearly progress criteria for 2 consecutive school years and is located in a violence-prone area, as determined by the Chicago Police Department, then the Chicago Board of Education shall require that (1) students receive at least 10 to 15 minutes of physical activity a day, (2) the school have at least one full-time social worker on-site, and (3) after-school physical activity and academic programs be available for students.
Title
SCH CD-CHI SCH-VIOLENCE PRONE
Sponsors
Rep. Annazette Collins [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Rep. Constance Howard [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-05-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2010 | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford | |
2010-05-03 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 007-004-000 | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education | |
2010-04-29 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-001-004 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-04-22 | Re-assigned to Executive | |
2009-05-26 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Held in Education | |
2009-05-05 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-05-01 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-05-01 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-04-28 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-30 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-03-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard | |
2009-03-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Annazette Collins | |
2009-03-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-03-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2009-03-27 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-26 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 020-000-000 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |