IL HB2249 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that 45 days prior to the scheduled discharge of a person committed to the custody of the Department of Corrections, the Department shall give the person: (1) information about obtaining a standard Illinois Identification Card or a limited-term Illinois Identification Card; (2) information about voter registration and may distribute information prepared by the State Board of Elections and may enter into an interagency contract with the State Board of Elections to participate in the automatic voter registration program and be a designated automatic voter registration agency under the Election Code; (3) information about job listings upon discharge from the correctional institution or facility; (4) information about available housing upon discharge from the correctional institution or facility; (5) a directory of elected State officials and of officials elected in the county and municipality, if any, in which the committed person intends to reside upon discharge from the correctional institution or facility; and (6) any other information that the Department of Corrections deems necessary to provide the committed person in order for the committed person to reenter the community and avoid recidivism (currently, the committed person is provided information, if uninsured, about applying for health care coverage including medical assistance under the Illinois Public Aid Code).
Title
CD CORR-RELEASEE-REENTRY INFO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-14-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2249&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2249.htm |