IL HB2244 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the conditions of every parole and mandatory supervised release include that the subject: (1) not knowingly frequent (rather than frequent) places where controlled substances are illegally sold, used, distributed, or administered; and (2) except when the association described in (2)(A) or (2)(B) involves activities related to community programs, worship services, volunteering, engaging families, or some other pro-social activity in which there is no evidence of criminal intent: (A) not knowingly associate with other persons on parole or mandatory supervised release without prior written permission of his or her parole agent; or (B) not knowingly associate with persons who are members of an organized gang as that term is defined in the Illinois Streetgang Terrorism Omnibus Prevention Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-CONDITIONS OF PAROLE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0382 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-017-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-051-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-11 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-3-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |