IL HB2243 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes changes concerning certifications required for township and multi-township assessors and supervisors of assessments. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-ASSESSOR QUALIFICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0467 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2019-03-28 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-02-28 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 2-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |