IL HB2239 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Southern Illinois University Management Act. Provides that both student members (rather than only one student member) of the Board of Trustees of Southern Illinois University shall be voting student members; makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SIU-BOARD OF TRUSTEES-MEMBERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-006-000
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-006-000
2019-03-06HouseRemains in Higher Education Committee
2019-03-06HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Higher Education Committee; 010-007-000
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1105202Amended CodeCitation Text
1105204Amended CodeCitation Text
1105205Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback