IL HB2237 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Treasurer Act. Provides that the State Treasurer shall establish the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program for the purpose of expanding access to higher education through savings. Provides for enrollment in the Program. Provides further duties and requirements of the Treasurer regarding the Program. Creates the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program Fund as a fund held outside of the State treasury to be the official repository of all contributions, appropriations, interest, and dividend payments, gifts, or other financial assets received by the State Treasurer in connection with operation of the Program or related partnerships. Provides for audits and reports concerning the Program. Allows the Treasurer to adopt any rules that may be necessary to implement the Program. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to provide an exemption for information that is exempt from disclosure under the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED SAVINGS PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2019
2019-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2019
2019-05-22SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 009-004-000
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-09SenateRe-assigned to Higher Education
2019-05-09SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-042-001
2019-04-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-005-000
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-22HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-03-21HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-18HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-18HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-006-000
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1550516.8New CodeSee Bill Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback