IL HB2237 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Provides that the State Treasurer shall establish the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program for the purpose of expanding access to higher education through savings. Provides for enrollment in the Program. Provides further duties and requirements of the Treasurer regarding the Program. Creates the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program Fund as a fund held outside of the State treasury to be the official repository of all contributions, appropriations, interest, and dividend payments, gifts, or other financial assets received by the State Treasurer in connection with the operation of the Program or related partnerships. Provides for audits and reports concerning the Program. Allows the Treasurer to adopt any rules that may be necessary to implement the Program. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to provide an exemption for information that is exempt from disclosure under the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program.
Title
HIGHER ED SAVINGS PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0466 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-015-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 009-004-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Re-assigned to Higher Education |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-042-001 |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-005-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-22 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-18 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-18 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-006-000 |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |