IL HB2225 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Removes provisions specifying petition and referenda requirements for proposed statewide advisory public questions. Modifies the procedures for: petition signature sample verification, including removing specified responsibilities of election authorities; valid signature calculation; and petition verification watchers. Makes conforming changes. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTION CD-PUBLIC QUESTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 28-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 28-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 28-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 28-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 28-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2225&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2225.htm |