IL HB2224 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning pleadings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIVIL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik
2021-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2021-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik
2021-03-19HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Amy Elik
2021-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
75551-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback