IL HB2222 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Local Library Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning penalties.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0746 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-03-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 5 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |