IL HB2218 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Provides that, if a district board's membership has been expanded or reduced by referendum or resolution, the additional members will be elected not earlier than 197 days (currently, 60 days) after the referendum or resolution and a reduction of board members will not affect the terms of any commissioners holding office at the time of the referendum or to be elected within 197 (currently, 60) days after the referendum. Provides that, if the terms of a district's board members have increased or decreased after referendum or resolution, the terms will commence with the first regular park district election at least 197 days (currently, 60 days) after the date on which the terms were increased or reduced by referendum or resolution. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PARK DIST-BD MEMBERS & TERMS
Sponsors
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Michael Kelly [D] | Rep. Matt Hanson [D] | Rep. Harry Benton [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro [R] | Rep. Cyril Nichols [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1205 | 2-10a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1205 | 2-12a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2218&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2218.htm |