IL HB2175 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retail Electric Competition Act of 2006 of the Public Utilities Act. Provides that any information in the report submitted by the Office of Retail Market Development on June 30 of each year involving price comparison between electric utilities, electric utilities providing service outside their service territories, or alternative retail electric suppliers shall also include the combined value of certain additional products and services offered by the competitive retail electricity market. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission may include other energy savings and marketing savings programs as they develop in the market.
Title
UTILITY-RETAIL MARKET DEVELOP
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 20-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2175&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2175.htm |