IL HB2159 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Requires coverage for breast pumps approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration. Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires coverage under the medical assistance program for breast pumps approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-GROUP INS-BREAST PUMP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-22HouseTo Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.16New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback