IL HB2159 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Requires coverage for breast pumps approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration. Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires coverage under the medical assistance program for breast pumps approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
MEDICAID-GROUP INS-BREAST PUMP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2159&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2159.htm |