IL HB2154 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, for recipients of public aid who are required to comply with the terms of a service plan developed by the Department of Children and Family Services, participation in substance abuse treatment, drug testing, parenting classes, anger management, domestic violence counseling, evaluations, or any other activities specified in the service plan shall count as an approvable job search activity under TANF employment, education, and training programs; the SNAP Employment and Training Program; and any job search, training, and work programs authorized under Article IX of the Code. Requires the Department of Human Services to apply for any federal waivers or approvals necessary to implement the job search exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUB AID-JOB SEARCH EXEMPTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 097-016-000
2019-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 097-016-000
2019-05-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-05-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2019-05-27HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
2019-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-05-21HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2019-05-21HouseArrived in House
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-011-000
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-003-000
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-002-000
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Human Services
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.52New CodeSee Bill Text
30559-6Amended CodeCitation Text
30559A-9.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2154&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2154.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2154eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2154enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2154sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2154sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2154_03292019_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB2154_05212019_040000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2154sam002_05292019_031001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2154sam001_05292019_031000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback