IL HB2119 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may issue United Nations Protection Force license plates to residents who served in the United Nations Protection Force in Yugoslavia. Provides that the original issuance fee shall be $15 and the renewal fee shall be $2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UN PROTECTION FORCE PLATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Transportation; 013-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 013-000-000
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-699.17New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback