IL HB2099 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Food Truck Freedom Act. Provides that a unit of local government may not require a separate license, permit, or fee beyond an initial or reciprocal business license for a food truck business. Contains provisions regarding reciprocal business licenses issued to food truck businesses by different units of local government or local health departments. Contains prohibitions against units of local governments or local health departments from imposing additional license qualification requirements on a food truck business before issuing licenses. Provides that, for an initial business license, a unit of local government or local health department may only charge a licensing fee to a food truck business in an amount that reimburses the unit of local government for the actual cost of processing the business license. Requires food truck businesses to obtain, for each food truck that the food truck business operates, an annual health department food truck permit from the local health department with jurisdiction over the area in which the majority of the food truck's operations takes place. Includes provisions relating to food truck events and food trucks at temporary mass gatherings. Contains other provisions. Effective January 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOOD TRUCK FREEDOM ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-05HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2024-01-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-01-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
2024-01-31HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-15HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2023-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback