IL HB2094 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the powers and duties of the Director of Employment Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMPLOYMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8204051700Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback