IL HB2093 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-5)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Workforce Innovation Board Act. Provides that on or before December 15, 2019, and on or before each December 15 thereafter, the Illinois Workforce Innovation Board must review labor market data and projections in this State and must submit to the State Board of Education and the Illinois Community College Board a list of each career area, along with a designation of one of 3 categories. Amends the Vocational Academies Act. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2020, the State Board must allocate grants to vocational academies with consideration to certain factors. Provides that on or before December 15, 2020, and on or before each December 15 thereafter, the State Board must report to the General Assembly enrollment and completion data for each vocational academy and the number and type of pathway endorsements issued to students under a Community Partnership for Pathway Endorsement grant program. Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that, subject to appropriation and allocation of matching grants through the federal Carl D. Perkins Career and Technical Education Act of 2006, the Illinois Community College Board must administer a program to provide Community Partnership for Pathway Endorsement grants to community college districts; specifies grant requirements. Provides that no more than 20 grants may be awarded each year and the grant amount must be at least $40,000 for a partnership that serves 5 high schools and may be up to $75,000 for a partnership that serves more than 5 high schools. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VOCATIONAL ACADEMIES-GRANTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-08-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-08-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-07-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-07-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-07-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-07-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-07-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-07-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-07-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-07-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-06-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-06-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
2019-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-06-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-06-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-05-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-02-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10543315Amended CodeCitation Text
10543320New CodeSee Bill Text
1108052-16.02Amended CodeCitation Text
2039754.7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback