IL HB2093 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-5)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Workforce Innovation Board Act. Provides that on or before December 15, 2019, and on or before each December 15 thereafter, the Illinois Workforce Innovation Board must review labor market data and projections in this State and must submit to the State Board of Education and the Illinois Community College Board a list of each career area, along with a designation of one of 3 categories. Amends the Vocational Academies Act. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2020, the State Board must allocate grants to vocational academies with consideration to certain factors. Provides that on or before December 15, 2020, and on or before each December 15 thereafter, the State Board must report to the General Assembly enrollment and completion data for each vocational academy and the number and type of pathway endorsements issued to students under a Community Partnership for Pathway Endorsement grant program. Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that, subject to appropriation and allocation of matching grants through the federal Carl D. Perkins Career and Technical Education Act of 2006, the Illinois Community College Board must administer a program to provide Community Partnership for Pathway Endorsement grants to community college districts; specifies grant requirements. Provides that no more than 20 grants may be awarded each year and the grant amount must be at least $40,000 for a partnership that serves 5 high schools and may be up to $75,000 for a partnership that serves more than 5 high schools. Effective immediately.
Title
VOCATIONAL ACADEMIES-GRANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-08-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-07-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-07-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-07-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-07-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-07-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-07-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-07-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-07-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-06-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-06-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-06-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-06-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2019-06-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-06-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-06-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 433 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 433 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 2-16.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3975 | 4.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |