IL HB2085 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides for a water's edge apportionment election for certain members of a unitary business group. Provides that, with respect to foreign corporations that make a water's edge election, the deduction for dividends is limited to 75%.
Title
INC TX-WATER'S EDGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-06 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-28 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 1501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |