IL HB2084 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
Pending: House Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With respect to school discipline improvement plans, makes changes to how the State Board of Education determines the top 20% of school districts, when notification is given that a plan must be submitted, which school districts are required to submit a plan, the timeframe for school board approval of a plan and submission of that plan to the State Board, and when additional annual progress reports are required. Establishes the Safe Schools and Healthy Learning Environments Grant Program and grants under the program. Sets forth requirements for grant applicants and provisions for the distribution of funds appropriated for the program. Requires the State Board of Education to issue a yearly report on the results of the program in cooperation with school districts participating in the program. Provides that the State Board may adopt any rules necessary for the program. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFE SCHOOLS/HEALTHY LEARNING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-26HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-05-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-26HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-26HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-24HouseArrived in House
2019-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-017-000
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 012-003-000
2019-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2019-05-14SenateWaive Posting Notice
2019-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Re-assigned to Education
2019-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Education
2019-05-14SenateRe-assigned to Education
2019-05-14SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-08SenatePostponed - Education
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-01SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Education
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-002-000
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-001-000
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-02-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.162Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.176New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback