IL HB2078 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that in fixing the salaries of teachers, a school board shall pay those who serve on a full-time basis a rate not less than (i) $32,076 for the 2020-2021 school year, (ii) $34,576 for the 2021-2022 school year, (iii) $37,076 for the 2022-2023 school year, and (iv) $40,000 for the 2023-2024 school year. Provides that the minimum salary rate for each school year thereafter, subject to review by the General Assembly, shall equal the minimum salary rate for the previous school year increased by a percentage equal to the percentage increase, if any, in the Consumer Price Index For All Urban Consumers for all items published by the United States Department of Labor for the previous school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-MINIMUM TEACHER SALARY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Education; 013-003-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Education
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-04-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 079-031-000
2019-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-09HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-03-14HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-03-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-002-000
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-02-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524-8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback