IL HB2072 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that no dental carrier may automatically enroll a provider in a leased network without allowing any provider that is part of the dental carrier's provider network to choose to not participate by opting out. Provides that the provisions do not apply if access to a provider network contract is granted to a dental carrier or an entity operating in accordance with the same brand licensee program as the contracting entity or to a provider network contract for dental services provided to beneficiaries of specified health plans. Provides that any contract entered into or renewed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act that allows the rights and obligations of the contract to be assigned or leased to another insurer shall provide for notice that informs each provider in writing via certified mail 60 days before any scheduled assignment or lease of the network to which the provider is a contracted provider (rather than shall provide notice of that assignment or lease within 30 days after the assignment or lease to the contracting dentist). Provides that no insurer, dental service plan corporation, professional service corporation, insurance network leasing company, or any company that amends, delivers, issues, or renews an individual or group policy of accident and health insurance on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall require a dental care provider to incur a fee to access and obtain payment or reimbursement for services provided. Provides that a dental plan carrier shall provide a dental care provider with 100% of the contracted amount of the payment or reimbursement. Provides that fees incurred directly by a dental care provider from third parties related to transmitting an automated clearing house network claim, transaction management, data management, or portal services and other fees charged by third parties that are not in the control of the dental plan carrier shall not be prohibited by the provisions. Makes other changes.
Title
INS-DENTAL NETWORK PLAN CHANGE
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0024 |
2023-06-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2023-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2023-03-08 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2023-03-08 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Insurance Committee; Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2023-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-03-02 | House | To Insurance Main Subcommittee |
2023-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2023-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 355.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |